+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 689
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/6/2018
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 6, 2018: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor