+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 842
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2016
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/28/2016
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2016
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2016
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 28, 2016: SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor