+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 11/01/2020
- Pub. Ch. 780
On July 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On July 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Signed by H. Speaker
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 6/18/2020
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0950)
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0843)
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 (Amendment 3 - HA0959)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0959)
- Am. 3 reconsidered.
- Motion to reconsider adopted.
- Motion to lift from table adopted.
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0843)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0950)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0959)
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0686)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0626)
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/11/2020
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
June 18, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2
- Yeas: 9
June 18, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1
- Yeas: 9
June 18, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 3
- Yeas: 9
June 17, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
June 16, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
June 8, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 11, 2020: TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor