+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 560
- Effective date(s) 03/14/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0682)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 3/1/2018
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0682)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0568)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0572)
- Move to Heel
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/7/2018
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/30/2018
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1
- Yeas: 8
February 22, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
February 7, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 8
February 7, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Kelsey
- Yeas: 8
January 30, 2018: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor