+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2014
- Action Def. in S .F,W,&M Comm. to 4/16/14
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2014
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/12/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/5/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 2/19/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 2/19/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 2/5/2014
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0822
Amendment 1-0 to SB1597
+ − Vote
March 12, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor