+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 932
- Effective date(s) 04/27/2016
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA1053)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1053)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0787)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/15/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/1/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2016
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 18, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 9
April 11, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
March 23, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 15, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor