+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 626
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/18/2020
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 10
February 18, 2020: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor