+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/31/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/11/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/4/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/4/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 2/25/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor