+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/02/2020
- Pub. Ch. 659
On April 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 24, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0682)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0670)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendment #2
- Senate concurred in House amendment #1
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0563)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/9/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/4/2020
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 19, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1
- Yeas: 9
March 19, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2
- Yeas: 9
March 19, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
March 9, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 4, 2020: TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor