+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 543
- Effective date(s) 03/17/2014
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 81, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/24/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/19/2014
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
February 19, 2014: S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor