+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 430
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/1/2021
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/16/2021
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
April 27, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
March 1, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor