+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 1/29/2014
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor