+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 776
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1096)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/8/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2014
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA1096
Amendment 1-0 to SB1558
+ − Vote
April 2, 2014: S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor