+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 762
- Effective date(s) 04/19/2016
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0916)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/4/2016
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0916)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0634)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/7/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/2/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 1/27/2016
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 8
March 30, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
March 7, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 8
March 2, 2016: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8