+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 657
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB subst.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/24/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
- Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30
March 19, 2014: S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor