+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 508
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0375)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0120)
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/6/2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
May 3, 2021: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
April 20, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor