+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 406
- Effective date(s) 05/21/2019
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0367)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/2/2019
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Government Operations Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 4/3/2019
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/6/2019
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
May 2, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: FINAL CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
April 17, 2019: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE:
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor