+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 532
- Effective date(s) 03/07/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/12/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/7/2018
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
February 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 8
February 7, 2018: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor