+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 299
- Effective date(s) 05/08/2019
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/27/2019
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
February 27, 2019: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor