+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 6
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/15/2019
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
March 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
February 20, 2018: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor