+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 5
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/15/2019
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor