+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 474
- Effective date(s) 06/06/2017
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 4 - HA0620)
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 5/9/2017
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 1, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA0620)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0548)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0509)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0508)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0506)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0442)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0443)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Recalled
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 calendar for 5/4/2017
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/17/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 4/3/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/29/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2017
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2017
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/20/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2017
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (7)
May 9, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 4
- Yeas: 9
May 5, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 82
May 5, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 4 BY Lamberth PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 82
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
May 2, 2017: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
April 17, 2017: SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
April 17, 2017: TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9