+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 542
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/22/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/13/2018
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 13, 2018: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor