+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 925
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Senate concurred in Amendment (Amendment 1 - HA0935)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/11/2016
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on message calendar for 4/11/2016
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/7/2016
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0935)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0685)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/14/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/8/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/1/2016
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2016
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/23/2016
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/9/2016
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 11, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 9
March 31, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
March 14, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 8, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor