+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 607
- Effective date(s) 04/02/2018
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0764)
- Move to Heel
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0763)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0764)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0619)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/26/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/21/2018
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2
- Yeas: 8
March 12, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
February 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
February 21, 2018: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor