+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 578
- Effective date(s) 03/28/2014
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 1/27/2014
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 1/21/2014
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 10, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
January 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
January 21, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor