+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 1/27/2014
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 1/21/2014
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
January 21, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 7