+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 12, 2019: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor