+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 879
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2016
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2016
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2016
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/28/2016
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2016
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2016
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 5, 2016: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 28, 2016: SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor