+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 699
- Effective date(s) 04/12/2018
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/5/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/28/2018
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On October 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
March 5, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
February 28, 2018: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor