+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 514
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 5/3/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 13, 2021: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor