+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 187
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2015
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/30/2015
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/24/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
March 30, 2015: FLOOR VOTE:
- Yeas: 9
March 24, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 24, 2015: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor