+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 658
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 for 3/19/2020
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2020
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Cal 3-19-20
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/16/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/9/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2020: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
April 16, 2019: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor