+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 20
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE:
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor