+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 28
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 5/8/2017
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
May 8, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor