+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 681
- Effective date(s) 03/24/2016
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/8/2016
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/2/2016
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On December 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 9
February 2, 2016: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor