+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 671
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/17/2016
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/9/2016
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On December 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 17, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
February 17, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 8
February 9, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor