+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 639
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/10/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 2/4/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On December 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
February 10, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
February 4, 2014: S. C&L COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor