+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/11/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/4/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/11/2014
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/11/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 1/28/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor