+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2014
- Action Def. in S .F,W,&M Comm. to 4/16/14
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2014
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/recommend to summer study comm.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/11/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/4/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/4/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 2/25/2014
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On November 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor