+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 612
- Effective date(s) 04/04/2014; 07/01/2014
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0773)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0625)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/24/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 2/12/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On October 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0625
Amendment 1-0 to SB1433
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
February 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 30
February 12, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor