+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 96
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0043)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/27/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud. Comm cal. for 3-19-13
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Jud Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 2/27/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0043
Amendment 1-0 to SB0143
+ − Votes (2)
March 19, 2013: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 9
February 27, 2013: S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor