+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Gov't Ops. comm
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 3/19/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/26/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 2/19/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/5/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On October 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor