+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 506
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0310)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0322)
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
April 19, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
April 13, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor