+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 3
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 3/26/2015
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 26, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor