+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 23
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0350)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013
- S. Reset on cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 4/11/2013
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C held on desk. Local Bill
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0350
Amendment 1-0 to SB1401
+ − Vote
April 11, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor