+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 1
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 2/25/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C held on desk. Local Bill
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
February 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30