+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 235
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 3, 2019: TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor