+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1008
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2016
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2016
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2016
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2016
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/5/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/29/2016
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 2
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2016
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2016
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
April 5, 2016: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 14, 2016: SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 2
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor