+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Judiciary Comm. 4/20/21
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
- Recalled from Senate Delayed Bills Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 20, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor